Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Taxpayers' Savings Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Stocksdale
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified parent or legal guardian to receive reimbursement of tuition paid to a nonpublic school, under specified circumstances; establishing the eligibility for and the amount of the reimbursement; prohibiting reimbursement in an amount that is more than a specified cost; prohibiting the use of federal funds for reimbursement; requiring counties to include specified students in their full-time equivalent enrollment; requiring that specified funds be subtracted from State financial assistance to a county; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/08/2013 Text - First - Education - Taxpayers' Savings Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-216 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM