Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Purchases From the Department of Liquor Control - Exception for Wholesalers MC 7-16
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that Montgomery County may authorize a specified private licensed wholesaler to sell and distribute specified beer and wine products not purchased from the Department of Liquor Control for Montgomery County; providing that Montgomery County may authorize the Department to classify specified beer and wine products that a licensed wholesaler may sell and distribute; and requiring the Department to establish by order of the County Executive a specified surcharge under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM