Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Interagency Commission on School Construction - Reimbursement to Eligible Counties
Sponsored by
Delegate P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Interagency Commission on School Construction to reimburse certain eligible counties for costs incurred by the county to fund the State's share of a school construction project under certain circumstances; specifying the requirements and time period for reimbursement; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Education - Interagency Commission on School Construction - Reimbursement to Eligible Counties
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-303.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM