Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Websites - Reporting of Politically Biased Algorithms
Sponsored by
Delegates M. Fisher, Adams, Arentz, Boteler, Chisholm, Clark, Corderman, Impallaria, Malone, Mautz, Miller, Morgan, Otto, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain websites that implement certain politically biased algorithms to file a certain report with the State Board of Elections within 7 days after implementing the politically biased algorithm; requiring certain websites that implement politically biased algorithms to file certain additional reports with the State Board at certain times under certain circumstances; prescribing the contents of certain reports; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Websites - Reporting of Politically Biased Algorithms
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Websites - Reporting of Politically Biased Algorithms
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-405.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM