Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - Interagency Council on Homelessness
Sponsored by
Delegates M. Washington, Rudolph, Arora, Dumais, Eckardt, Glenn, Griffith, Kaiser, Mitchell, Nathan-Pulliam, Summers, Vaughn, Wilson, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the Governor's Advisory Board on Homelessness and establishing an Interagency Council on Homelessness; establishing the membership, staffing, chair, quorum, and meeting times of the Council; prohibiting a member of the Council from receiving specified compensation but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; establishing specified duties of the Council; requiring the Department of Human Resources to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0796
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {624263/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments {624263/2 Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 61
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Rereferred to Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-417, 6-418 through 6-420, 6-421 through 6-424, 6-422, 6-423, 6-425, 6-426, 6-427 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM