Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for Pregnancy
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Barron, Gutierrez, Healey, Jalisi, Kelly, Lierman, Pena-Melnyk, Valderrama, Wilkins, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain health benefit plans and certain carriers to provide a special enrollment period during which certain individuals who become pregnant may enroll in a health benefit plan; establishing the duration of the special enrollment period; establishing certain effective dates of coverage for certain individuals enrolled in certain health benefit plans during the special enrollment period; applying the Act to all health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2019; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1643 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for Pregnancy
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   15-1201, 15-1208.1, 15-1316 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page