Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Condominiums - Individual Exceptions to Limitations on Rentals (Maryland Condominium Owners Emergency Relief Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the governing body of a condominium to grant a specified individual exception to any provision of the declaration, bylaws, or rules of the condominium that limits rentals under specified circumstances; requiring a condominium unit owner to be granted the individual exception if the unit owner submits a specified written request and specified evidence; establishing a 3-year term for an exception granted under the Act; requiring a governing body to provide a specified denial in writing; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1195 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-111.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM