Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Barbers - Employment of Apprentice Barbers - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from 1 to 3, the maximum number of apprentice barbers per master barber that a barber shop may employ at the same time; and repealing a limit on the total number of apprentice barbers that a barbershop may employ at the same time.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Barbers - Employment of Apprentice Barbers - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Barbers - Employment of Apprentice Barbers - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Barbers - Employment of Apprentice Barbers - Alterations
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Barbers - Employment of Apprentice Barbers - Alterations
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Senate 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/15/2020 7:13 PM