Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsored by
Delegates Cardin, Barkley, Bobo, Carr, Frick, George, Hucker, Luedtke, Mizeur, Murphy, Niemann, Reznik, Rosenberg, and Stein
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating a public financing system for General Assembly candidates; repealing the Public Financing Act for gubernatorial candidates; altering limits on contributions and transfers, as specified; providing that specified contributions be considered as being made by one contributor; authorizing the governing body of a county to enact laws to regulate public campaign finance activity for county elective offices and candidates for those offices, as specified; specifying expenditure limits for participating candidates; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0584
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0195 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014, June 1, 2013
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-226, 13-227, 13-235, 13-505, 15-101 through 15-111, 15-101 through 15-118 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM