Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Best Available Technology Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Cardin, Morhaim, and Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to adopt regulations that establish safety standards and practices applicable to the design, construction, operation, and maintenance of gas pipelines; requiring the Commission to adopt regulations that require a gas transmission company to use best available technology to monitor the condition and safety of gas pipelines; requiring the Commission to adopt specified federal safety regulations as minimum standards for regulations adopted under the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0602
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101 through 15-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM