Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Itineris Foundation
Sponsored by
Delegates Hayes, Conaway, and B. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $100,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of Itineris, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Itineris Foundation building, located in Baltimore City; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0492
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM