Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing
Sponsored by
Delegate Davis
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a peer-to-peer car sharing program from being considered to have rented a certain vehicle, to be a rental vehicle company, or to be a motor vehicle company under certain provisions of law solely on a certain basis; prohibiting a shared vehicle owner from being considered to have rented a vehicle under certain provisions of law solely on a certain basis; prohibiting a certain motor vehicle from being considered to be a rental vehicle under a certain provision of law; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0743
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Insurance – Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Insurance – Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing
House 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
(   10-601, 19-520 )
(   11-148.1, 18-108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page