Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway Funds
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Afzali, Aumann, Bates, Beitzel, Eckardt, Elliott, Fisher, Frank, George, Glass, Haddaway-Riccio, Hogan, K. Kelly, Kipke, McComas, McDermott, McMillan, Myers, Norman, O'Donnell, Otto, Parrott, Ready, Schuh, Schulz, Serafini, Smigiel, Stocksdale, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that specified taxes, fees, charges, and revenues deposited into the Transportation Trust Fund may be used only for specified purposes; repealing obsolete provisions; and repealing provisions relating to the transfer of specified funds from the Transportation Trust Fund to a special fund.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0367 Session: 2010 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM