Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure Process - Filing Requirements - Mediation Procedures
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering specified timing requirements for filing an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust on residential property; authorizing the Office of Administrative Hearings to hold a prehearing conference before a prefile mediation session and before a postfile mediation session; and altering the rules of procedure for contested cases of the Office of Administrative Hearings that govern a foreclosure mediation on residential property.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/08 (Delegate Grammer) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {783328/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (45-90)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Residential Property - Foreclosure Process - Filing Requirements - Mediation Procedures
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/08 (Delegate Grammer) Adopted 40
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Floor Amendment {783328/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (45-90) 41
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed 41
Text - Third - Residential Property - Foreclosure Process - Filing Requirements - Mediation Procedures
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 43
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 42
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM