Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Employees' Pension System - Prince George's County Officials - Membership PG 418-14
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that membership in the Employees' Pension System is optional for specified individuals employed by Prince George's County in specified positions on or after specified dates; requiring individuals who elect to join the Employees' Pension System to make the election within a specified period of time; providing that membership in the Employees' Pension System is prohibited for specified individuals; requiring the State Retirement Agency to provide a specified report on or before December 1, 2014, to the Joint Committee on Pensions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {334464/1
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Jones) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {334464/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Favorable with Amendments {334464/1 45
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Jones) Adopted 45
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments {334464/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47
Senate 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM