Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Occupational or Professional Licenses - Issuance to Undocumented Immigrants - Prohibited
Sponsored by
Delegates McDonough and McComas
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State from issuing an occupational or professional license, certification, or registration to an undocumented immigrant; and defining the term "undocumented immigrant" to mean an individual who is a foreign national and is illegally present in the United States with the intent to remain in the United States indefinitely.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Hearing cancelled (Economic Matters)
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-101, 21-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM