Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Installment Agreements
Sponsored by
Delegate Jalisi
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a minimum 35% required down payment in connection with specified bail bond installment agreements; providing a maximum term of 15 months for the agreements; requiring a specified bail bondsman to file a civil action for specified relief under specified circumstances; and qualifying the actions that a bail bondsman shall take with respect to specified collections by requiring the bail bondsman to make specified efforts to obtain judgment under specified circumstances.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary and Economic Matters
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM