Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Enterprise Zone and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Programs - Small Business Entities
Sponsored by
Delegate Walker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for specified small business entities located in an enterprise zone or a Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise (RISE) zone; allowing a small business entity to claim the credit as a credit for the payment to the Comptroller of specified taxes; altering the definition of "qualified property" for purposes of a specified property tax credit on a specified assessment of specified real property located in a RISE zone so as to include specified personal property; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1021
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017, July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Enterprise Zone and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Programs - Small Business Entities
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1406, 5-707 )
(   10-741 )
(   9-103.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM