Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Waldstreicher, Dumais, and Luedtke
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Enacting the Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law Act; establishing requirements for a collaborative law participation agreement and the collaborative law process; establishing standards for the disclosure of information during the collaborative law process; making the provisions of the Act severable; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0805
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 66
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1901 through 3-1915 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM