Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Alteration
Sponsored by
Delegate Walker (By Request - Tax Credit Evaluation Committee)
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definitions of "qualified position" and "State priority funding area" for purposes of the job creation tax credit program; requiring the Department of Commerce to certify the amount of the tax credit for which a qualified business entity is eligible; altering the calculation of the credits earned under the program; prohibiting the Department from certifying tax credits in a taxable year in excess of $4,000,000; applying the Act to job creation tax credits certified after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0873
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {105869/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Alteration
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {105869/1 Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Text - Third - Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Alteration
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Referred Rules 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-301, 6-303, 6-304, 6-305, 6-307, 6-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM