Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Integrated Community Oncology Reporting Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Bromwell, Angel, Barron, Cullison, Hayes, Impallaria, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Oaks, Platt, Rose, Saab, and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the integrated community oncology reporting program; establishing the purpose of the program; requiring the program to be administered by the Maryland Health Care Commission; requiring the Commission to adopt regulations to implement the program and to develop a specified application process; establishing a specified exception to a specified prohibition against self-referrals by specified health care practitioners; authorizing specified health care practitioners to use a specified exemption; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Integrated Community Oncology Reporting Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {566086/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Integrated Community Oncology Reporting Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Finance
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Integrated Community Oncology Reporting Program
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments {566086/1 Adopted 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Integrated Community Oncology Reporting Program
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 51
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Finance 48
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-301, 1-302, 1-3B-01 through 1-3B-08 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM