Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Length of Service Award - Fire Fighters, Rescue Squad Members, and Rescue Dive Team Members - Increase Authorized
Sponsored by
Calvert County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the County Commissioners of Calvert County to enact a local law that increases the amount of benefits that a specified member of any Calvert County volunteer fire company, volunteer rescue squad, or rescue dive team is eligible to receive to $700 per month, for life, and increases the amount of an additional payment each month for each full year of volunteer service in excess of 25 years to $10 per month; and repealing a provision setting a specified maximum benefit.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM