Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Synthetic Cannabinoids - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified authorized provider to conduct research in the State with specified controlled dangerous substances not scheduled under federal law under specified circumstances; listing synthetic cannabinoids on Schedule I to designate controlled dangerous substances that may not be legally used, possessed, or distributed; defining a specified term; requiring the Department of State Police to report to the General Assembly on or before July 1, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {922312/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Favorable with Amendments {922312/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 44
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/17/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-304, 5-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM