Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - School Closures - Consultations
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Anderson, Clippinger, Glenn, Haynes, McIntosh, Mitchell, Oaks, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Stukes, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners to conduct specified public meetings and consult with the Parent and Community Advisory Board before a vote to close a specified school that is not included in a specified 10-Year Plan.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0994
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-320 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM