Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Premium Finance - Refunds and Debts
Sponsored by
Delegate Lisanti
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a premium finance company to satisfy a debt owed under a premium finance agreement within the preceding 3 years with a refund due under a premium finance agreement with the same company; and requiring that a premium finance agreement to satisfy a debt with a refund must include a certain disclosure.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0637
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Premium Finance - Refunds and Debts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Insurance - Premium Finance - Refunds and Debts
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM