Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Video Lottery Operation Licensee - Employee Data Collection
Sponsored by
Delegate Haynes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 662
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a Baltimore City video lottery operation licensee to compile specified data concerning specified employees and submit the data to the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission on or before a specified date; and requiring the Commission to submit a specified report to the General Assembly and specified other persons within a specified time.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {789737/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 662
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Second Reading Passed 45
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 47
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 46
Senate 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable with Amendments {789737/1 Report Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 65
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 662
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1A-01, 9-1A-23 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM