Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Special Education - Individualized Education Program Facilitated Meetings
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each local school system to offer the services of an independent facilitator to specified parents and school personnel; authorizing specified parents and school personnel to request the participation of an independent facilitator in a specified meeting; requiring specified parents and school personnel to be offered an opportunity to resolve a specified disagreement in a meeting with an independent facilitator before a specified mediation or due process hearing; and defining "independent facilitator".
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM