Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Meetings and Timeliness of Certification and Licensure Issuance
Sponsored by
Delegates Jacobs, Arentz, Carozza, Ghrist, Mautz, Otto, and Sample-Hughes
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the frequency at which the State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists is required to meet; requiring the Board, on or before January 1, 2018, to collaborate with the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish goals for the timeliness of issuing specified certificates and licenses; and requiring the Board to submit specified reports to the Secretary on or before specified dates.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Meetings and Timeliness of Certification and Licensure Issuance
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
(   17-101, 17-204, 17-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page