Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on Public School Efficiency
Sponsored by
Delegates Smigiel, McDermott, and Glass
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Public School Efficiency; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; establishing the duties of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2014; and terminating the Act at the end of June 30, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM