Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Testamentary Instruments - Fraud and Undue Influence
Sponsored by
Delegate Guyton
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a presumption that provisions of a testamentary instrument transferring property to certain individuals are the product of fraud and undue influence under certain circumstances; establishing that a presumption of fraud and undue influence over a testamentary instrument may be rebutted by clear and convincing evidence except under certain circumstances; providing that a beneficiary who challenges and fails to rebut the presumption established under the Act shall bear certain costs; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Testamentary Instruments - Fraud and Undue Influence
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-501 through 1-505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM