Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - 10-Year Plan for Public School Facilities - Neighborhood Revitalization and Community Development
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, Rosenberg, B. Robinson, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Stating a specified finding of the General Assembly; requiring the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners to provide specified information to specified residents and community leaders; requiring the Board to provide an opportunity to specified individuals to coordinate specified efforts with a specified design team; requiring a specified committee to provide an opportunity to specified individuals to communicate specified efforts to a specified committee; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0714
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-320 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM