Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Permits, Training, Prohibited Acts, and Violations
Sponsored by
St. Mary's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the serving size of a sample serving of beer permitted to be served to an individual by a holder of a Class BWTS beer and wine tasting or sampling license in St. Mary's County; establishing a BWT beer and wine tasting permit in St. Mary's County to allow the on-premises consumption of beer and wine for tasting purposes only; providing that a person who violates a specified law is subject to license revocation or suspension and a specified civil penalty; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1015
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {763195/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654538/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments {763195/1 Report Adopted 41
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
House 3/14/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 43A
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Senate 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {654538/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 60
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   28-102, 28-1306, 28-1307, 28-1411, 28-2501, 28-2802 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM