Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Freedom of the Press Day
Sponsored by
Delegates Cain, Acevero, Anderton, Bagnall, B. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Bhandari, Branch, Brooks, Carey, Carr, Chang, Charles, Chisholm, Conaway, Cox, D.E. Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Feldmark, W. Fisher, Gilchrist, Glenn, Healey, Hill, Holmes, Ivey, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Lafferty, Lehman, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lisanti, Lopez, Luedtke, Malone, McIntosh, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Proctor, Qi, Reznik, Rogers, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Walker, C. Watson, Wells, Wilkins, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim June 28 as Freedom of the Press Day to commemorate the protected right of free press as identified in the First Amendment to the Constitution of the United States of America.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0397
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Freedom of the Press Day
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Freedom of the Press Day
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-413, 7-413 through 7-417 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM