Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Flexible Workweek
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, Carr, Glenn, Ivey, Mitchell, B. Robinson, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing specified business entities a credit against the State income tax for the cost of providing a flexible workweek to the employees of the business entity in the State; requiring that a specified number of a business entity's full-time employees in the State work a flexible workweek in order to claim the credit; providing that the credit may not exceed a specified amount; applying the Act to tax years beginning after December 31, 2012; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1145 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/08/2013 Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Flexible Workweek
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-733 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM