Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Audits of Election Results
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Gutierrez, C. Howard, A. Miller, Pena-Melnyk, Rosenberg, and Turner
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a local board of canvassers to complete specified ballot accounting, reconciliation, and tabulation audit procedures in a specified manner before certifying the results of an election; requiring the State Board of Elections to adopt specified regulations relating to ballot accounting and reconciliation procedures; requiring that a tabulation audit be conducted of at least specified contests in specified elections; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-308, 11-309, 12-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM