Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Queen
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the State Board of Sign Language Interpreters in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation; providing that certain provisions of law do not apply to certain individuals; providing for the composition of the Board and the appointment, terms, qualifications, expenses, and removal of the Board members; providing for the chair and the term of the chair of the Board; establishing that a majority of members then serving is a quorum; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-101 through 22-502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM