Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Transfers of Franchises
Sponsored by
Delegate Valderrama
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a vehicle manufacturer to make certain requests of a person seeking to transfer a vehicle dealer franchise or any right under a vehicle dealer franchise within 20 days after receiving notice of the proposed transfer; requiring a vehicle manufacturer to consent to a transfer or provide a written statement with specific grounds for refusing consent within 75 days after receiving all completed forms and requested information from the transferor; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0813
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {853996/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Transfers of Franchises
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-35)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {853996/1 Adopted 49B
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49B
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Transfers of Franchises
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (97-35) 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 51A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 53A
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 9:07 AM