Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Law Enforcement Surveillance Technologies
Sponsored by
Delegate Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Law Enforcement Surveillance Technologies for the purpose of reviewing the current and planned use of surveillance technology by law enforcement agencies in the State, including specified matters; requiring State agencies represented to staff the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to submit its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 5, 2017; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {542819/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Task Force to Study Law Enforcement Surveillance Technologies
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-2)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - State Government - State Commission on Surveillance Technology and Civil Rights
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {542819/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Task Force to Study Law Enforcement Surveillance Technologies
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-2) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page