Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Nondisclosure Agreements - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Hornberger
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified employers from including a specified nondisclosure agreement in specified documents, requiring an employee to enter into a nondisclosure agreement, or establishing an expectation with an employee that a specified relationship exists with respect to specified information.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page