Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools and Shelters - Homeless Girls and Women - Feminine Hygiene Products
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Miller, Dumais, Gutierrez, Morales, Queen, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 641
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Resources to make available to specified entities specified supplies of feminine hygiene products for female residents in shelters and specified homeless female students; requiring, alternatively, if a specified contingency is met, the Department of Housing and Community Development to make available to specified entities supplies of feminine hygiene products for female residents in shelters and homeless female students; requiring specified products to be made available in a specified manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Shelter Services for Homeless Women - Feminine Hygiene Products
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Shelter Services for Homeless Women - Feminine Hygiene Products
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-6)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {567071/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates A. Miller, Wilkins and McKay)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates A. Miller, Wilkins and McKay)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Klausmeier, Reilly and Benson)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Klausmeier, Reilly and Benson)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Conference Committee Report {763027/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-1)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Conference Committee Report {763027/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 641
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Shelter Services for Homeless Women - Feminine Hygiene Products
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43
Text - Third - Shelter Services for Homeless Women - Feminine Hygiene Products
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Third Reading Passed (132-6) 45
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Referred Finance 44
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {567071/1 Adopted 57
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 House Requests Senate Recede 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates A. Miller, Wilkins and McKay) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Requests Senate Recede 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates A. Miller, Wilkins and McKay) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Refuses Recede 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Klausmeier, Reilly and Benson) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Refuses Recede 67
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Klausmeier, Reilly and Benson) 67
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Conference Committee Report {763027/1 Adopted 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-1) 68
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Conference Committee Report {763027/1 Adopted 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Schools and Shelters - Homeless Girls and Women - Feminine Hygiene Products
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 641
Text - Chapter - Public Schools and Shelters - Homeless Girls and Women - Feminine Hygiene Products
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM