Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-TM (Theater/Museum) License
Sponsored by
Allegany County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Class B-TM (theater/museum) beer, wine, and liquor license in Allegany County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the license for use by a theater/museum that has a ballroom with a maximum seating capacity of 300 per event; establishing that the license authorizes the license holder to sell at retail beer, wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption and in conjunction with certain events; establishing the hours and days for sale for the license; setting a $350 fee; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0645
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-TM (Theater/Museum) License
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 41
Text - Third - Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-TM (Theater/Museum) License
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Third Reading Passed (122-0) 43
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Text - Chapter - Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-TM (Theater/Museum) License
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1001.1, 9-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM