Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Professional Development for Teachers and Providers of Early Childhood Education - Master Plan
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg and Kaiser
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, in collaboration with the Maryland Higher Education Commission and specified representatives from specified institutions of higher education, to develop a master plan that focuses on specified issues relating to qualified providers of early childhood education services; requiring the Department and the Commission to submit a specified plan and specified recommendations to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2015; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0677
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {125966/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-6)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {125966/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Third Reading Passed (134-6) 62
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 59
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Second Reading Passed 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 68
House 4/14/2015 4/11/2015 Returned Passed 72
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM