Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Members
Sponsored by
Delegates Buckel, Beitzel, Corderman, Hornberger, Impallaria, Krebs, Luedtke, McComas, McKay, Otto, Parrott, Rose, Shoemaker, Szeliga, Wivell, Afzali, Ali, Ebersole, C. Howard, Kaiser, Long, Mosby, Reilly, Tarlau, Turner, Wilkins, and Jackson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 582
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain qualifying volunteer fire, rescue, and emergency medical services members.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1269
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {675464/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {909333/1
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {909333/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 582
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Members
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {675464/1 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Members
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {909333/1 58
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Smith) Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {909333/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Members
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 582
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Members
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM