Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Retroactive Denial of Reimbursement to Health Care Providers
Sponsored by
Delegates Platt, Saab, and Sample-Hughes
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain carrier that retroactively denies reimbursement to a certain health care provider under certain provisions of law to provide the health care provider certain notice of the retroactive denial, at least 30 days to respond to the notice, and the option to pay the amount of the denied reimbursement in lieu of retention by the carrier of certain funds; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Retroactive Denial of Reimbursement to Health Care Providers
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1008 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM