Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - City of College Park - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses for Supermarkets PG 310-13
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the maximum number of licenses of a specified class of alcoholic beverages licenses allowed to be issued in Prince George's County; authorizing the Prince George's County Board of License Commissioners to issue a Class D beer and light wine license with an off-sale privilege for use by a supermarket or similar type of premises in College Park under specified circumstances; and prohibiting the Board of License Commissioners from issuing a specified license under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM