Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Vehicle Titling Fee and Vehicle Excise Tax - Active Duty Members of the Military
Sponsored by
Delegates Crosby, Lisanti, Rogers, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Motor Vehicle Administration from charging a fee for the issuance of a new certificate of title for a vehicle that is owned by a certain member of the military who is on active duty; and altering the amount of the excise tax imposed for the issuance of a certificate of title to $100 for a vehicle that is owned by a certain member of the military who is on active duty.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Text - First - Transportation - Vehicle Titling Fee and Vehicle Excise Tax - Active Duty Members of the Military
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-802, 13-809 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM