Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Health and Wellness Standards - Correctional Facilities and Health Care Facilities
Sponsored by
Delegate Hill
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Facilities, with the advice of the Secretary of Health, to update certain minimum mandatory standards for inmate food services to reflect certain practices and guidelines, by January 1, 2022, and at least every 5 years thereafter; requiring that certain minimum standards include a procedure for an inmate to elect to change to certain food and beverage options without requiring a certain exception; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0322
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Text - First - Health - Health and Wellness Standards - Correctional Facilities and Health Care Facilities
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
(   19-308,   21-1301, 21-1302 )
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 1:51 PM
Click to return on the top page