Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Crude Oil Rail Transport - Risk Assessment and Accident Prevention Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Atterbeary, Carr, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gutierrez, Healey, Hill, Kaiser, Lierman, McComas, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Platt, B. Robinson, Smith, and Tarlau
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to study the potential risks and impacts to the State in the event of a crude oil spill during rail transport in the State; requiring the Department to establish specified plans as part of the study; requiring the Department to report the study's findings and plans to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 1, 2015; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {510218/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-14)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {510218/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Special Order until next session (Delegate Buckel) Adopted 50
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
House 3/24/2015 3/22/2015 Third Reading Passed (123-14) 52
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 First Reading Finance 49
Senate 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM