Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Fourth Amendment Protection Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Smigiel, Dwyer, Glass, Kipke, McComas, McDermott, Parrott, and Serafini
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Stating the policy of the State concerning the collection of specified electronic data or metadata of a person without a warrant; prohibiting an agency of the State, a political subdivision of the State, an employee of an agency or political subdivision, or a corporation providing services on behalf of the State or a political subdivision from engaging in specified activities relating to the collection of specified electronic data or metadata of a person; and providing for specified penalties.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-101 through 17-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM