Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Antibiotic Drug Usage - Food-Producing Animals
Sponsored by
Delegate Morhaim
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from administering an antibiotic drug to a food-producing animal under specified circumstances; requiring the State Department of Agriculture to establish by regulation a specified program; requiring regulations adopted by the Department to include specified provisions; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0470
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Reassigned to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Reassigned to Environment and Transportation 27
House 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/14/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1001 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM